EST
ENG
RUS
President
Official Duties
Media
Republic of Estonia
Biography
CV of President Toomas Hendrik Ilves
Oath of the President
President Ilves took the oath of office on 9 October 2006
Legal authority
Excerpts from legal acts governing the president’s official duties
Patronage
Organizations and projects supported by the head of state
Institutions
Institutions under the jurisdiction of the President of the Republic
Ieva Ilves
News about the president's spouse and the biography of Ieva Ilves
Speeches
Unabridged text of speeches delivered by the head of state in Estonia and abroad
Visits
Overview of state visits, official visits and working visits made by the President to other countries
Decorations
Recipients of Estonian state decorations. Proposals for bestowing decorations.
Press Releases
Press releases from the Office of the President
Statements
Statements by the President of the Republic, including joint statements issued by the President of the Republic, the President of the Riigikogu and the Prime Minister
Interviews, Articles
President Ilves in the Estonian and foreign media
Bibliography
The President’s speeches, articles and interviews published in print, also overviews of the President’s public activities and publications about him
Videos
Video recordings of presidential speeches and public messages, interviews and other events
Photo album
Photo albums arranged by event
Declaration of Independence
Adopted by the Estonian Provincial Assembly’s council of elders on 24 February 1918
The Constitution
The Constitution of the Republic of Estonia, adopted on 28 June 1992
Symbols
The Estonian flag, coat of arms and national anthem, and legal acts on state insignia
Estonia
Links to other government institutions, the citizen’s portal and Estonian Public Broadcasting
Heads of State
Heads of state from 1918, through the years of occupation, until restoration of independence
Visits:
2006
2007
2008
2009
2010
2011
2012
2013
2014
2015
2016
Working Visit to Russia
27.06.2008 - 30.06.2008
Working Visit to Canada
26.05.2008 - 30.05.2008
Working Visit to the United States
17.04.2008 - 23.04.2008
State Visit to Ireland
13.04.2008 - 16.04.2008
Working Visit to
06.04.2008 - 08.04.2008
Working Visit to Bucharest
01.04.2008 - 03.04.2008
Working Visit to Strasbourg
11.03.2008 - 12.03.2008
Working Visit to Lithuania
16.02.2008 - 17.02.2008
Working Visit to Brussels
03.02.2008 - 05.02.2008
Start
Prev
1
2
3
Next
End